+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-3)
On March 15, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing canceled
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Ways and Means
- Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-246 - Article - Tax - Property
+ − Votes (4)
March 17, 2020: Third Reading Passed (130-3)
- Yeas: 130
- Nays: 3
February 27, 2020: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
February 24, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
February 6, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor