+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 287
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 15, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
- Hearing canceled
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Health and Government Operations
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {214635/1 Adopted
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 1/15 at 3:00 p.m.
On September 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 14-801 through 14-803 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (4)
March 17, 2020: Third Reading Passed (133-0)
- Yeas: 133
January 30, 2020: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
January 27, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor