+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {410414/1 Report Adopted
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On October 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
410414/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 16-812 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 28, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 25, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
January 25, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor