+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 13-207 - Article - Tax - Property
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2019: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 29, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
March 15, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 12, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor