+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {172712/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On September 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
172712/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 29, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
February 1, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor