+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (39-8)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {634933/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendment
634933/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 10-1102 - Article - State Government
- 10-1103 through 10-1105 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor