+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 797679/1 Report Adopted
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
797679/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2018: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 30, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 15, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 12, 2018: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor