+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {659236/1 Report Adopted
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/02 at 8:30 a.m.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
659236/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2017: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 28, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 16, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 13, 2017: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor