+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 9, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On January 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
On September 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
April 1, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
January 21, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
January 18, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor