+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {634234/1 Report Adopted
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
634234/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-202 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2014: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 27, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
March 6, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor