+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-306 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 22, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor