+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Judiciary
- Referred Judiciary
On March 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Criminal Organizations – Penalties and Procedure
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {268379/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Criminal Organizations - Penalties, Procedure, and Elements
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 6-112 - Article - Correctional Services
- 9-801, 9-802, 9-803, 9-804, 9-805, 9-807 - Article - Criminal Law
- 7-303 - Article - Education
- 14-125.2 - Article - Real Property
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2020: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
February 6, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor