+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 444335/1 Report Adopted
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid Over (Senator Feldman) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 444335/1
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
444335/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor