+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Appropriations
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (43-4)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {799039/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/21 at 9:00 a.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/21 at 8:30 a.m.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
799039/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 21-104 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2013: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 29, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 22, 2013: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 21, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor