+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Economic Development - COVID-19 Small Business Grant Program (COVID-19 Crisis Small Business Survival Program Act of 2021)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {557671/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Economic Development - COVID-19 Small Business Grant Program (COVID-19 Crisis Small Business Survival Program Act of 2021)
- First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 1-101, 5-1701 through 5-1704 - Article - Economic Development
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
February 10, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
February 10, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor