+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On October 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-1008 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
April 1, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
February 9, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 4, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor