+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendment
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {344169/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {194335/1 Report Adopted
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On November 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2014: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 28, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 28, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 13, 2014: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor