+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Judiciary
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (32-14)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment 333823/3 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
- Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
- Floor Amendment 273520/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-30)
- Floor Amendment 173428/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-30)
- Floor Amendment 593529/1 (Senator Bailey) Withdrawn
- Floor Amendment 773526/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 748674/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-201 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 31, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 14
March 30, 2019: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {173428/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 30
March 30, 2019: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {273520/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 30