+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Children's Vaccines - Study and Temporary Authority
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (117-15)
- Floor Amendment {293028/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (41-90)
- Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Cullison) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {293028/1 (Delegate Hornberger)
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Text - Third - Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Children's Vaccines - Study and Temporary Authority
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {994531/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 12-508 - Article - Health Occupations
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2021: Floor Amendment {293028/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (41-90)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 90
April 10, 2021: Third Reading Passed (117-15)
- Yeas: 117
- Nays: 15
March 31, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 31, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
February 12, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor