+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 832
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On December 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-403 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2018: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 5, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 8, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
+ − Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
Type:
Primary Sponsor