+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Environmental Matters
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {764037/1 Report Adopted
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On October 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
764037/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2014: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
March 29, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
January 28, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
January 23, 2014: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor