+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Surveys
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred Health and Government Operations
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Surveys
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {237776/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Site Visits and Surveys
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 19-1408 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2021: Third Reading Passed (133-0)
- Yeas: 133
March 11, 2021: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46