+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-1)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (37-9)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {547579/1 Report Adopted
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {547579/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing cancelled
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
547579/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2013: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
April 3, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
- Nays: 1
March 25, 2013: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 23, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 9
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor