+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (45-1)
- Senate Concur - House Amendment
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-4)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Sydnor) Adopted
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {285063/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (43-1)
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {233127/1 Adopted
- Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {569834/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-305 - Article - Tax - Property
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2015: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 3, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 4
April 3, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
March 20, 2015: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor