+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Bay Restoration Fund - County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (117-20)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred Appropriations
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Bay Restoration Fund - County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {344431/1 Adopted
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Bay Restoration Fund - County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 19-1001 through 19-1004 - Article - Local Government
+ − Votes (4)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (117-20)
- Yeas: 117
- Nays: 20
March 17, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 12, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
February 12, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor