+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {787670/1 Report Adopted
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On October 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
787670/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-206 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 23, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
February 28, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 23, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor