+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-428 - Article - Human Services
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2019: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 29, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
March 16, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46