+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (87-47)
- Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Delegate Frick) Adopted
- Third Reading Passed (84-48)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (39-6)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 753024/1 Report Adopted
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Executive Nominations
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/05 at 5:00 p.m.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Executive Nominations
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
753024/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-3A-01 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (4)
March 23, 2018: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 19, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 47
March 12, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 6
March 7, 2018: Senate - Committee - Executive Nominations
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor