+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - State and Local Housing Programs - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 752
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Enrolled - State and Local Housing Programs - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Concurs House Amendments
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (106-31)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {940719/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Referred Environment and Transportation
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - State and Local Housing Programs - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {274534/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Text - First - State and Local Housing Programs - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 2-302, 2-401, 2-402 - Article - Housing and Community Development
- 3-114 - Article - Land Use
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
April 8, 2021: Third Reading Passed (106-31)
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 31
March 19, 2021: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 18, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
February 3, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor