+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (33-13)
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Dyson) Adopted (26-19)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {187479/1 Report Adopted
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid Over (Senator Brinkley) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {187479/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
187479/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 25, 2013: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 24, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 13
March 23, 2013: Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Dyson) Adopted
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 19