+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Statute Amended
- 14-303 - Article - Family Law
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2017: House - Committee - Judiciary
April 1, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 16, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47