+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-3)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {380212/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {824738/1 Report Adopted
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 10, 2015: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
April 5, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
- Nays: 3
April 5, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor