+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing cancelled (Finance)
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing cancelled (Finance)
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor