+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Judiciary
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 758171/1 Report Adopted
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
758171/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 31, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor