+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {877379/1 Report Adopted
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
877379/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-604 - Article - Human Services
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2017: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 29, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
March 15, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 13, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor