+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Enrolled - Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Concurs House Amendments
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (120-17)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {183293/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred Economic Matters
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Digital Inclusion - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {574437/1 Adopted
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Digital Inclusion - Established
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 13-501 through 13-506, 5-1101, 5-1102 - Article - Economic Development
- 6.5-101 through 6.5-107, 6.6-107 - Article - Housing and Community Development
- 6-226 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
April 7, 2021: Third Reading Passed (120-17)
- Yeas: 120
- Nays: 17
March 16, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
January 22, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
January 22, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor