+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {207875/1 Report Adopted
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
207875/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2015: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
April 2, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
March 17, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 12, 2015: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor