+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 316
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing canceled
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Appropriations
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-310 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
March 17, 2020: Third Reading Passed (134-0)
- Yeas: 134
March 5, 2020: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 2, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
February 5, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor