+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 366
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Enrolled - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Senate Concurs House Amendments
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (131-0)
- Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (128-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {876081/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Referred Health and Government Operations
On March 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {747276/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 19-349.2 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (6)
March 17, 2020: Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (128-0)
- Yeas: 128
March 17, 2020: Third Reading Passed (131-0)
- Yeas: 131
March 17, 2020: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 15, 2020: Third Reading Passed (44-0)
- Yeas: 44
March 14, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
February 7, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor