+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendment
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {522819/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On March 23, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {668472/1 Report Adopted
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-301 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2013: House - Committee - Judiciary
April 1, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 30, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
March 18, 2013: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor