+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 6, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 483499/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 607070/1 Report Adopted
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On October 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2019: House - Committee - Economic Matters
April 1, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 30, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
March 15, 2019: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor