+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 11, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Judiciary
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Committee Amendment {768776/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {528178/1
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {528178/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 6, 2015: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 2, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor