+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-403 - Article - Natural Resources
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2018: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
April 2, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
March 8, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor