+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-5)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Environmental Matters
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (42-0)
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {654136/1 Report Adopted
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On November 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
654136/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2013: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
March 31, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 5
January 24, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 42
January 21, 2013: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor