+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Department of Transportation and Spending Affordability Committee - Reports
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 563
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On March 13, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred Appropriations
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Department of Transportation and Spending Affordability Committee - Reports
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Department of Transportation and Spending Affordability Committee - Reports
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2022: Third Reading Passed (134-0)
- Yeas: 134
March 10, 2022: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
February 2, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
February 2, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor