+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 693
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {649439/1 Report Adopted
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
649439/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-302 - Article - Tax - Property
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2017: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 29, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
March 9, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 6, 2017: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor