+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 777676/1 Report Adopted
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
On September 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
777676/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 27-803 - Article - Insurance
+ − Votes (4)
March 23, 2018: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 19, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
January 23, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
January 18, 2018: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor