+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {318373/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendment
318373/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 24-109 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44