+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (88-49)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (32-13)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments 597371/1 Report Adopted
- Floor Amendment 293126/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
- Committee Amendment 597371/1
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Astle) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 597371/1
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 17-224 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (4)
March 19, 2018: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 15, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 49
March 9, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 13
March 1, 2018: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor