+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- House Recede
- Motion Recede (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senators Lee, West, and Cassilly
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Requests House Recede
- Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
- Favorable with Amendments 362914/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Judiciary
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 618476/1 Report Adopted
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2019: House - Committee - Judiciary
April 1, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 21, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 21, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor